Alizadeh-Khiavi, Kamel (CPSO#: 71104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Azari, English, Farsi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Sanders Street East
Exeter ON  N0M 1S0
Phone: (519) 235-0333
Fax: (888) 541-2292
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Alizadeh-Khiavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2005


Corporation Name: Kamel Alizadeh-Khiavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alizadeh-Khiavi ( CPSO# 71104 )

Business Address:
17 Sanders Street East
Exeter ON  N0M 1S0
Phone Number: (519) 235-0333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMEL ALIZADEH-KHIAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIZADEH-KHIAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2013