Aljawad, Mohammed Saleh H (CPSO#: 92621)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre, 800 Commissioners Road East, London, ON, N6A 5W9
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016