Aljohani, Faisal Furayj S (CPSO#: 111603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  26 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tabuk, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
427-600 University Avenue Toronto
M5G 1X5
University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G1X5
Phone: 4165865133
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAISAL FURAYJ S ALJOHANI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALJOHANI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALJOHANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALJOHANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALJOHANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALJOHANI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALJOHANI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 26 Feb 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2017