Alkazaleh, Fawaz Abdaleh (CPSO#: 74413)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002