Alkenbrack, Kaleigh Elizabeth (CPSO#: 106269)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KALEIGH ELIZABETH ALKENBRACK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALKENBRACK is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALKENBRACK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALKENBRACK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALKENBRACK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALKENBRACK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALKENBRACK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017