Alkhadhari, Sulaiman E H Sh (CPSO#: 79530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Aug 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SULAIMAN E H SH ALKHADHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHADHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2003 to 04 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 10 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2004 to 10 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017