Alkhalaf, Hamad Abdullah H (CPSO#: 97172)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 25 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014