Alkhayat, Duaa Salem M (CPSO#: 107874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2015

Expiry Date:  07 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 28 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 17276
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUAA SALEM M ALKHAYAT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALKHAYAT is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. ALKHAYAT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALKHAYAT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALKHAYAT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALKHAYAT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALKHAYAT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 07 May 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Aug 2015 to 27 Oct 2015
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2018