Alkhiari, Resheed Eid R (CPSO#: 97473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Qassim University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 73495
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System Ontario
1200 Fourth Ave, St. Catherines, ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 43148
Fax: (905) 704-4195
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RESHEED EID R ALKHIARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHIARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 03 May 2012 to 20 Jun 2012
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2017