Alkhunaizi, Ahd Abdulmohsin (CPSO#: 102830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:King Faisal University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHD ABDULMOHSIN ALKHUNAIZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKHUNAIZI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 31 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015