Alkins, Ryan David (CPSO#: 86927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3 - 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6666 Ext. 3696
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alkins ( CPSO# 86927 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Ottawa ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN DAVID ALKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015