Allaby, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 66562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 43302
Fax: (905) 577-1432
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Allaby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Allaby ( CPSO# 66562 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN ALLABY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLABY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1996