Allan, David Scott (CPSO#: 71203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 74018
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David S Allan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Allan ( CPSO# 71203 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road Box 704
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001