Allan, Melissa Adrienne (CPSO#: 73842)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Allan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jan 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Apr 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017