Allan, Randy Raymond George (CPSO#: 64528)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 10 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 13, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Randy Raymond George Allan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

2. Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code by the College (the “Investigation”) regarding whether I have engaged in professional misconduct and whether I have displayed incompetence.
3. Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.
4. Have resigned from the College effective June 1, 2011.
5. Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario.
6. Agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the Investigation it terminated as a result of this Undertaking and/or to proceed with a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
9. Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated.
12. Give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
13. Agree that this undertaking will be entered on the pubic register as information that is available to the public.