Allan, Rebecca Jane (CPSO#: 76043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 236-8749
Fax: 855-720-1223
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca Allan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Allan ( CPSO# 76043 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE ALLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007