Allard, Johane (CPSO#: 57862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9N 973
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5159
Fax: (416) 348-0065
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johane Allard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Allard ( CPSO# 57862 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 9N 973
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANE ALLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989