Alled, Jalal Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 72917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
911A Jane Street
York ON  M6N 4C6
Phone: (647) 345-5855
Fax: (647) 345-5057
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Alled Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alled ( CPSO# 72917 )

Business Address:
911A Jane Street
York ON  M6C 4C6
Phone Number: (647) 345-5855

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JALAL ABDULAZIZ ALLED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003