Allen, Angelita Rivera (CPSO#: 27905)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008