Allen, Donna Barbara (CPSO#: 73403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna B. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Allen ( CPSO# 73403 )

Business Address:
St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
4th Floor
Brantford ON  N3S 6T6
Phone Number: (519) 756-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA BARBARA ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001