Allen, Edward Charles (CPSO#: 22169)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Health Care Centre 130 Adelaide Street West Lower Concourse PO Box 92 Toronto, ON M5H 3P5 Tel: 416 361 6142
Instructions: Individuals looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Andy Gidwani.
Date Received: 05 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016