Allen, Gillian Brook (CPSO#: 22684)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1970
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010