Allen, Gregory Charles (CPSO#: 52968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3739 Griffin Lane SE
Olympia WA  98501
United States
Phone: (360) 438-6400
Fax: (360) 438-6435

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CHARLES ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989