Allen, Judith Margaret (CPSO#: 57556)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013