Allen, Julie Katherine (CPSO#: 59504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 438-7666
Fax: (519) 438-7418
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie K. Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Allen ( CPSO# 59504 )

Business Address:
215 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-7666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE KATHERINE ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990