Allen, Murray William (CPSO#: 53879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 10
Room 01 M 28
190 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 12061
Fax: (613) 761-4982
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamilton and Allen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hamilton ( CPSO# 54412 )
Dr. M. Allen ( CPSO# 53879 )

Business Address:
Room 01 M 28
190 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
Perley Rideau Veterans
Health Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 526-7171

Business Address:
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY WILLIAM ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 16 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1985