Allen, Richard Eric (CPSO#: 62439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4800 Leslie Street
Suite 410
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 497-9900
Fax: (416) 497-6992
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ERIC ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991