Allen, Robert James (CPSO#: 61947)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre P O Box 909 Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1B4
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2014