Allen, Upton Dilworth (CPSO#: 53201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8219
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jamaica

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UPTON DILWORTH ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1991