Allen, Vanessa Gray (CPSO#: 77875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Ontario Laboratories
661 University Avenue 17th floor
Toronto ON  M9P 3T1
Phone: (647) 792-3163
Fax: (416) 649-4512
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 526-5441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA GRAY ALLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2006