Allen, Victoria Mary (CPSO#: 70897)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Nov 1996 to 23 Dec 1996
Elective Trainee - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2004