Allingham, John Douglas (CPSO#: 26752)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007