Allison, David James (CPSO#: 30562)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 May 2005