Allison, Keith Philip (CPSO#: 80387)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sheffield, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 16 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004