Allison, Patrick James (CPSO#: 85771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 522-9101
Fax: (705) 522-5744
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Allison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Allison ( CPSO# 85771 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
2120 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 522-9101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JAMES ALLISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 2006 to 14 Dec 2006
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009