Alloo, Javed Abbas (CPSO#: 73970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nymark Medical Centre
4839 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K8
Phone: (416) 498-3600
Fax: (416) 498-1211
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Javed Alloo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alloo ( CPSO# 73970 )

Business Address:
Nymark Plaza
4839 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K8
Phone Number: (416) 498-3600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAVED ABBAS ALLOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001