Almadani, Jamal Omran J (CPSO#: 111397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 14 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5641
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMAL OMRAN J ALMADANI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMADANI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALMADANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMADANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALMADANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMADANI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMADANI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Dec 2017.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2017 to 13 Apr 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2017