Almadani, Mahmud Husin Mohamad (CPSO#: 69773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 565
Fax: (905) 579-1583
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centennary
Health System
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7103
Fax: (905)721-7774
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905)721-7774
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895 4521
Fax: (905) 721-7774
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Qunite Health Care Belleville
265 Dundas street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969 7400
Fax: (905) 721-7774
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Rouge Valley Health System- Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2L4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 721-7774
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahmud Almadani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Almadani ( CPSO# 69773 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2L4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7103

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Feb 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMUD HUSIN MOHAMAD ALMADANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMADANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 27 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 28 Dec 1998 to 08 Feb 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 1999 to 08 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2000 to 08 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2001 to 08 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Feb 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Oct 2006