Almagor, Doron (CPSO#: 62437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
55 Eglinton Avenue East
www.possibilitiesclinic.com
Toronto ON  M4P 1G8
Phone: (416) 482-5558
Fax: (416) 482-8999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Doron Almagor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Almagor ( CPSO# 62437 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
55 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1G8
Phone Number: (416) 482-5558

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORON ALMAGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAGOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1992