Almakki, Nazar Elnour Mohamed (CPSO#: 90811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 403
2863 Ellesemre Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 792-0836
Fax: (416) 792-0837
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

520 Ellesmere Rd Unit # G118
Scarborough ON  M1R0B1
Canada
Phone: 4166739370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Almakki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Almakki ( CPSO# 90811 )
Dr. S. Timol ( CPSO# 87223 )

Business Address:
4129 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 2S2
Phone Number: (416) 439-1991

Business Address:
Unit 403
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 792-0836

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZAR ELNOUR MOHAMED ALMAKKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAKKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009