Almalaq, Ali Abdulaziz Abdulmohsin (CPSO#: 73353)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 1999 to 28 Feb 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Feb 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000