Alman, Benjamin Aaron (CPSO#: 65853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Nov 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2178
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts
USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN AARON ALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Jul 1993
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1997