Almansoori, Khaled Khader Ali Mohamed (CPSO#: 72916)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 03 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2000 to 13 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004