Almarhabi, Hassan Ahmad H (CPSO#: 111748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 25 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
585 University Avenue 11PMB 139C
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN AHMAD H ALMARHABI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMARHABI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALMARHABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMARHABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALMARHABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMARHABI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMARHABI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Apr 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 23 Jul 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2017