Almasoud, Abdulaziz Omar M (CPSO#: 98930)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015