Almehairi, Mohammad Matar Obaid Khalifa (CPSO#: 97318)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Feb 2012 to 14 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 15 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013