Almehmadi, Fahad Saleh M (CPSO#: 92607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-111B
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 32739
Fax: 519-663-3782
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHAD SALEH M ALMEHMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMEHMADI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2010 to 28 May 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014