Almhri, Ali Hussain S (CPSO#: 108541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI HUSSAIN S ALMHRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMHRI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALMHRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMHRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALMHRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMHRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMHRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 04 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017