Almowallad, Sameerah Bandar Mohammedsaleh (CPSO#: 108729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 24 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Urogynecology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 5864566
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEERAH BANDAR MOHAMMEDSALEH ALMOWALLAD may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALMOWALLAD is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALMOWALLAD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMOWALLAD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALMOWALLAD shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALMOWALLAD ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALMOWALLAD ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2016 to 23 Jun 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018