Almutairi, Muna A B B (CPSO#: 107018)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2016